Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2961460

EP2961460 - GUIDEWIRE EXTENSION SYSTEM FOR A CATHETER PLACEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
07.06.2019Change - applicantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C.R. Bard, Inc.
IP Law Group
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
[2019/28]
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
C.R. Bard, Inc.
730 Central Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BLANCHARD, Daniel, B.
4507 Summerwood Drive
Bountiful, UT 84010 / US
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/01]
Application number, filing date13876666.206.12.2013
[2016/01]
WO2013US73577
Priority number, dateUS201361771703P01.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361771703 P
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014133617
Date:04.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2961460
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014
[2016/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2961460
Date:10.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.09.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FÜHRUNGSDRAHTVERLÄNGERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE KATHETERPLATZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/01]
English:GUIDEWIRE EXTENSION SYSTEM FOR A CATHETER PLACEMENT DEVICE[2016/01]
French:SYSTÈME D'EXTENSION DE FIL-GUIDE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PLACEMENT DE CATHÉTER[2016/01]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2015National basic fee paid 
31.08.2015Search fee paid 
31.08.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.2015Examination requested  [2016/01]
24.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.2019Fee for grant paid
02.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19170875.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008108911  (PALMER MATTHEW A [US], et al) [A] 3-6,8 * paragraphs [0093] - [0094]; figures 2, 13-15 *
International search[Y]US2011282285  (BLANCHARD DANIEL B [US], et al);
 [Y]US5158544  (WEINSTEIN JAMES D [US]);
 [A]US2007001006  (SCHUESSLER FREDERICK [US], et al);
 [A]US2012184896  (DELEGGE REBECCA COPENHAVER [US], et al);
 [A]US5944690  (FALWELL GARY S [US], et al)