Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2986677

EP2986677 - POLYMER PARTICLES ADSORBED TO SULFATE-PROCESS TITANIUM DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohm and Haas Company
100 Independence Mall West
7th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US
For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2016/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BOHLING, James
1904 Stirling Drive
Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US
02 / CHEN, Junyu
Room 23-402
Lane 78
Wuchuan Rd.
Shanghai 200433 / CN
03 / CUI, Wei
Room 401
Building No.207
No. 788 Jinping Road
Shanghai 200240 / CN
04 / LI, Juan
Room 202, No. 27, Lane
569, Shangbo Road
Shanghai 200123 / CN
05 / WANG, Tao
Room 102-302, Lane
3151, Yindu Road
Shanghai 201108 / CN
 [2016/08]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/08]Mauro, Marina Eliana
Murgitroyd & Company
Piazza Borromeo, 12
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13882170.715.04.2013
[2016/08]
WO2013CN74189
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014169414
Date:23.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2986677
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN23.10.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/36, C09D5/02, C09D143/02
[2016/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/08]
TitleGerman:VON SULFAT-PROZESSTITANDIOXID ADSORBIERTE POLYMERTEILCHEN[2016/08]
English:POLYMER PARTICLES ADSORBED TO SULFATE-PROCESS TITANIUM DIOXIDE[2016/08]
French:PARTICULES POLYMÈRES ADSORBÉES PAR UN DIOXYDE DE TITANE OBTENU PAR LE PROCÉDÉ AU SULFATE[2016/08]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2015National basic fee paid 
02.10.2015Search fee paid 
02.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/08]
24.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/04]
19.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/04]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004054063  (BROWN WARD THOMAS [US] ET AL) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0089]; example 5; claim 3 * * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0625541  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 23, lines 51-56; claims 1, 5, 6, 7, 8, 10, 13 * * the whole document *;
 [XI]EP2426155  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0025]; claims 1,8,9 * * the whole document * [I] 2-8
International search[X]US5385960  (ROHM & HAAS);
 [A]CN1473893  (ZHANG, GUIZHOU);
 [A]CN1157840  (SANSHENG SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOG);
 [A]JP2006131715  (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA)