Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3009554

EP3009554 - PENETRATON SYSTEM FOR FABRIC AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FABRIC USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JIOS Aerogel Limited
50/F Hopewell Centre
183 Queen's Road East
Wanchai / HK
[2017/07]
Former [2016/16]For all designated states
Jios Aerogel Corporation
(Gajang-dong)531-14 Gajang-ro
Osan-si, Gyeonggi-do 447-210 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JOUNG, Young Chul
C-2304 Metapolis Apt.
Bansong-dong
Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-160 / KR
02 / ROH, Myung Je
109-1901 Samsung Remian Apt.
23 Dowon-dong
Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-748 / KR
03 / PARK, Jong Chul
205-2403 Daelim e-Pyeonhansesang 2 Danji Apt
10 Osan-ro132beon-gil
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 447-746 / KR
04 / KIM, Min Woo
23-155 Sambu Apt.2Danji
Taepyeong 2-dong
Jung-gu
Daejeon 301-774 / KR
05 / LEE, Mun Hyeong
504 hanil Building
610-13 Gwol-dong
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 447-140 / KR
06 / CHA, In Chang
402 Wellbeing Town
612-7 Gwol-dong
Osan-si Gyeonggi-do 447-140 / KR
07 / KIM, Hyoung Gook
336-1 Nogyang-dong
Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do 480-826 / KR
 [2016/16]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/16]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date13886647.022.07.2013
[2016/16]
WO2013KR06533
Priority number, dateKR2013006570810.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130065708
[2016/16]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014200144
Date:18.12.2014
Language:KO
[2014/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3009554
Date:20.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3009554
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR18.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:B05D5/00, D06B1/12, D06B5/08, B05C1/04, B05D1/26, B05D1/28, B05D3/02, D06B1/10, D06B3/20, D06B5/22, D06M15/05, D06M15/333, D06B3/10, D06B23/24
[2017/52]
Former International [2017/17]D06B1/12, D06B3/18, B05C11/04, D06B5/08
Former International [2016/16]D06B1/12, D06B3/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINDRINGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN GEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWEBEHERSTELLUNG DAMIT[2016/16]
English:PENETRATON SYSTEM FOR FABRIC AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING FABRIC USING SAME[2016/16]
French:SYSTÈME DE PÉNÉTRATION DE TISSU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TISSU L'UTILISANT[2016/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2016Translation filed 
11.01.2016National basic fee paid 
11.01.2016Search fee paid 
11.01.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/16]
13.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2018Fee for grant paid
18.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.12.2017
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE22.07.2018
LU22.07.2018
MT22.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL30.05.2018
AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE22.07.2018
LU22.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE22.07.2018
LU22.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE22.07.2018
LU22.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE22.07.2018
LU22.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
IE22.07.2018
LU22.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
LU22.07.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
MC30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]KR20120133856  (JIOS AEROGEL LIMITED) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0006] - [ 0017] - [0030]; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]JPH11128824  (HONEN CORP) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1065004  (NOK KLUBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0045] - [0050] - [0088] - [0092]; figure 16 *
International search[Y]KR20120133856  (JIOS AEROGEL LIMITED);
 [Y]JPH11128824  (HONEN CORP.);
 [A]KR940005759Y  (DONGYANG TEXTILES INDUSTRY CO.,LTD, AHN, CHANG GU);
 [A]KR870000453B  (SON, SANG ET AL.)
by applicantKR101255631B