Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3010279 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3010279



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 275
11.10.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.08.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
11.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
03.02.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
05.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
05.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
05.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 7
05.07.2016 Description Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Description Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 11
11.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.03.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.03.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
10.03.2016 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 6
09.03.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.01.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
04.01.2016 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 13
25.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.11.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
25.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 13
25.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 13
25.11.2015 Description Search / examination 46
25.11.2015 Drawings Search / examination 10
25.11.2015 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.10.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.02.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
18.12.2014 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.12.2014 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
18.12.2014 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 58