Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.08.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
10.07.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.02.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.08.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
07.07.2016 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.07.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.04.2016 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
08.04.2016 | First examination report | |
19.03.2016 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
18.03.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
18.03.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
14.03.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.01.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.12.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.11.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.11.2015 | Change - representative | |
26.11.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.12.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.12.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication |