Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3014878

EP3014878 - MULTI-VIEW THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH POSITION SENSING AND ADAPTIVE NUMBER OF VIEWS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / SONG, Jianping
Room 2-401, Building 24
Block 4, Longyue
Huilongguan Residential Area
Changping District
Beijing 102208 / CN
02 / SONG, Wenjuan
Room 04-301, Building No. 09
Block 4, Longyueyuan
Huilongguan Area
Changping District
Beijing 102208 / CN
03 / CHENG, Gang
2-601, Building No. 23
Baoshengli
Haidian District
Beijing 100192 / CN
 [2016/18]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
European Patent Operation
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13888249.328.06.2013
[2016/18]
WO2013CN78387
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014205785
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/53]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3014878
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014
[2016/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN31.12.2014
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/04
[2016/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/18]
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALES MEHRFACHANSICHTS-ANZEIGESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN MIT POSITIONSERFASSUNG UND ADAPTIVER ANZAHL VON ANSICHTEN[2016/18]
English:MULTI-VIEW THREE-DIMENSIONAL DISPLAY SYSTEM AND METHOD WITH POSITION SENSING AND ADAPTIVE NUMBER OF VIEWS[2016/18]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL MULTI-VUES À DÉTECTION DE POSITION ET NOMBRE ADAPTATIF DE VUES[2016/18]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2015National basic fee paid 
21.12.2015Search fee paid 
21.12.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/18]
19.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
14.09.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2521368  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 17] , [0 18] , [0 31] , [0 33] *
International search[X]EP2521368  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [Y]US2010123952  (CHEN WU-LI [TW], et al);
 [A]US2006139447  (UNKRICH MARK A [US]);
 [A]US2013050419  (NAKAMURA ATSUSHI [JP], et al)