Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3022954 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3022954



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 324
31.07.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
01.07.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.05.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.05.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
10.05.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
10.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.01.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
04.01.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.01.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 31
04.01.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 31
14.12.2018 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
13.12.2018 Claims Search / examination 4
13.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.12.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
05.11.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 28
09.08.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.08.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.08.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.08.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
09.08.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 30
10.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Description Search / examination 4
10.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.05.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.05.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.01.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
04.01.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.10.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
16.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.04.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 5
21.03.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
13.03.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
28.04.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.04.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.02.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
19.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.01.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.01.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
19.01.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.11.2015 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
28.08.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
11.08.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.01.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 35