Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3022954

EP3022954 - NETWORK ASSISTED AUTOMATIC DISASTER TRIGGER TO ENABLE DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) AD HOC COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.08.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, IT
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2016/21]For all designated states
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / NARAYANAN, Ram Lakshmi
1063 Morse Avenue
Apt. 8-101
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
 [2016/21]
Representative(s)Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2016/21]Borgström, Markus
Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG
T&I IPR Patent Administration
St.-Martin-Straße 76
80240 München / DE
Application number, filing date13889380.519.07.2013
[2016/21]
WO2013US51332
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015009321
Date:22.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3022954
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015
[2016/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3022954
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/02, H04W48/16, H04W76/50, H04W76/14, H04W8/00, H04W84/12
[2018/33]
Former International [2017/16]H04W4/02, H04W48/16, H04W76/00, H04W76/02, H04W84/12
Former International [2016/21]H04W4/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/21]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NETZWERKUNTERSTÜTZTER AUTOMATISCHER AUSFALLAUSLÖSER ZUR AKTIVIERUNG VON VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG (D2D)-AD-HOC-KOMMUNIKATION[2016/21]
English:NETWORK ASSISTED AUTOMATIC DISASTER TRIGGER TO ENABLE DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) AD HOC COMMUNICATION[2016/21]
French:DÉCLENCHEUR AUTOMATIQUE ASSISTÉ PAR RÉSEAU EN CAS DE CATASTROPHE POUR PERMETTRE UNE COMMUNICATION AD HOC DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF (D2D)[2016/21]
Entry into regional phase19.02.2016National basic fee paid 
19.02.2016Search fee paid 
19.02.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.2016Examination requested  [2016/21]
16.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
04.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2019Fee for grant paid
10.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US2006246896  (NEWBERG DONALD G [US], et al);
 [Y]US2010159948  (SPIVEY ANTHONY WAYNE [US], et al);
 [Y]WO0011828  (RLJ TIMESTAMP CORP [US], et al);
 [Y]US2012246692  (GHOSH CHITTABRATA [US]);
 [Y]US2002140560  (ALTMAN TODD M [US], et al);
 [Y]US2009291664  (SANDBERG JESPER [DK], et al);
 [Y]US2007171910  (KUMAR RAVI [US]);
 [A]US2010035642  (IWAMURA MIKIO [JP], et al);
 [A]EP1772994  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA])
by applicantUS2006246896
 US2007171910