EP3058469 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING MEDIA FILES BASED UPON CONTEXTUAL RELATIONSHIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, David 829 Dartshire Way Sunnyvale California 94087 / US | 02 /
KRISHNAN, Praveen 825 E. Evelyn Avenue Apt. 628 Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | 03 /
CHERIAN, Vijo 514 Fontanelle Court San Jose California 95111 / US | 04 /
YAO, Tsaifa 1814 Park Vista Circle Santa Clara California 95050 / US | [2016/34] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/34] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 13895568.7 | 14.10.2013 | [2016/34] | WO2013US64846 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015057185 | Date: | 23.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3058469 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F17/30 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
G06F16/24575 (US);
G06F16/438 (US);
G06F16/4393 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/34] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON MEDIA-DATEIEN AUF GRUNDLAGE KONTEXTUELLER BEZIEHUNGEN | [2016/34] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING MEDIA FILES BASED UPON CONTEXTUAL RELATIONSHIPS | [2016/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'IDENTIFICATION DE FICHIERS MULTIMÉDIA SUR LA BASE DE RELATIONS CONTEXTUELLES | [2016/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/34] | 29.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2018 | 17.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/16] | 11.03.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/16] | Appeal following examination | 01.04.2019 | Appeal received No. T2240/19 | 30.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009089288 (PETERSEN STEVEN L [US]) [I] 1-11 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0056] ** paragraph [0059] *; | [Y]US2013065526 (POTTIER MARC CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0049] *; | [Y] - NEIL O'HARE ET AL, MediAssist: Using Content-Based Analysis and Context to Manage Personal Photo Collections, IMAGE AND VIDEO RETRIEVAL LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 529 - 532, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-36018-6, XP019036074 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 529, paragraph last - page 530, paragraph 1 * * page 530, paragraph 2 * * page 531, paragraph 1 * | [A] - BEACH A ET AL, "WhozThat? evolving an ecosystem for context-aware mobile social networks", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080701), vol. 22, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MNET.2008.4579771, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 50 - 55, XP011232028 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MNET.2008.4579771 | [A] - BO XING ET AL, "Proximiter: Enabling mobile proximity-based content sharing on portable devices", PERVASIVE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2009. PERCOM 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090309), ISBN 978-1-4244-3304-9, pages 1 - 3, XP031453145 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - GARTRELL C M, "SocialAware: Context-Aware Multimedia Presentation via Mobile Social Networks", INTERNET CITATION, (2008), pages 1 - 42, URL: http://www.cs.colorado.edu/~rhan/Papers/Mike_Gartrell_CU_MS_thesis-final.pdf, (20100916), XP002601028 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - EAGLE N ET AL, "Social Serendipity: Mobilizing Social Software", IEEE PERVASIVE COMPUTING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20050401), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1109/MPRV.2005.37, ISSN 1536-1268, pages 28 - 34, XP011131389 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MPRV.2005.37 | International search | [A]US2005188399 (TISCHER STEVEN [US]); | [A]US2012209910 (SVENDSEN HUGH [US], et al); | [X]US2013065526 (POTTIER MARC CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) | by applicant | US2013065526 | - "MediAssist: Using Content-Based Analysis and Context to Manage Personal Photo Collections", O'HARE N. et al., Image and Video Retrieval. CIVR 2006. Lecture Notes in Computer Science, Springer, (20060000), vol. 4071, pages 529 - 532 |