blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3067262

EP3067262 - VEHICLE BODY FRAME STRUCTURE OF STRADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/37]VEHICLE BODY FRAME STRUCTURE FOR SADDLED VEHICLE
[2020/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kawasaki Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP
[2016/37]
Inventor(s)01 / ISHII, Hiroshi
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho
Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
02 / YAMAMOTO, Tomo
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho
Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
03 / SAEKI, Daisuke
c/o KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Kawasaki-cho
Akashi-shi
Hyogo 673-8666 / JP
 [2016/37]
Representative(s)Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/37]
Application number, filing date13896995.107.11.2013
[2016/37]
WO2013JP06567
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015068187
Date:14.05.2015
Language:JA
[2015/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3067262
Date:14.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3067262
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.05.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2017
ClassificationIPC:B62K11/04
[2016/37]
CPC:
B62K11/04 (EP,US); B62H1/02 (EP,US); B62K19/18 (EP,US);
B62K25/283 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIESTRUKTUR EINES SATTELFAHRZEUGS[2020/19]
English:VEHICLE BODY FRAME STRUCTURE OF STRADDLE-TYPE VEHICLE[2020/19]
French:STRUCTURE DE CADRE DE CORPS DE VÉHICULE D'UN VÉHICULE À SELLE[2020/19]
Former [2016/37]FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIESTRUKTUR FÜR EIN SATTELFAHRZEUG
Former [2016/37]VEHICLE BODY FRAME STRUCTURE FOR SADDLED VEHICLE
Former [2016/37]STRUCTURE DE CADRE DE CORPS DE VÉHICULE POUR VÉHICULE À SELLE
Entry into regional phase06.06.2016Translation filed 
06.06.2016National basic fee paid 
06.06.2016Search fee paid 
06.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/37]
01.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2020Fee for grant paid
30.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.05.2019
Opposition(s)09.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.11.2013
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB07.11.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/32]HU07.11.2013
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB07.11.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2022/27]HU07.11.2013
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB07.11.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2022/10]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB07.11.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/49]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
GB07.11.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/46]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/37]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
LU07.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/33]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
LU07.11.2020
Former [2021/31]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS06.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0207618  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,4,5,7,8,11-13 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPH11278346  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1,9,10 * abstract *;
 [Y]JP2000280964  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1,9,10* abstract *;
 [Y]WO2005111395  (AVL LIST GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 1-3,6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2088069  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]DE102008026705  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8,11-13 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2607221  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH11278346  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2000280964  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2008068858  (KTM SPORTMOTORCYCLE AG)
by applicantJP2007131030
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.