Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3079262

EP3079262 - ELECTRIC POWER ADJUSTMENT METHOD, ELECTRIC POWER ADJUSTMENT PROGRAM, ELECTRIC POWER ADJUSTMENT APPARATUS, AND SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.11.2018  [2018/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujitsu Limited
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2016/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HACHIYA, Nobuhide
c/o FUJITSU CONNECTED TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / TANII, Takashi
c/o FUJITSU CONNECTED TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / MURAKAMI, Yasuhiro
c/o FUJITSU SYSTEM INTEGRATION LABORATORIES LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / YAMAMORI, Yusuke
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
05 / TAKEUCHI, Yasuaki
c/o FUJITSU CONNECTED TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
06 / HIRAO, Masahiko
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
07 / MURAKAMI, Manabu
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
08 / HAYASHIHARA, Mikio
c/o FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2016/41]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/41]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date13898510.606.12.2013
[2016/41]
WO2013JP82875
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015083296
Date:11.06.2015
Language:JA
[2015/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3079262
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.06.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/04, H03F3/24, H03G3/20, H03F3/19, H03F1/32
[2016/48]
Former International [2016/41]H04B1/04, H03F3/24, H03G3/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
TitleGerman:STROMEINSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, STROMEINSTELLUNGSPROGRAMM, STROMEINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INTEGRIERTE HALBLEITERSCHALTUNG[2016/41]
English:ELECTRIC POWER ADJUSTMENT METHOD, ELECTRIC POWER ADJUSTMENT PROGRAM, ELECTRIC POWER ADJUSTMENT APPARATUS, AND SEMICONDUCTOR INTEGRATED CIRCUIT[2016/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE, PROGRAMME DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE, APPAREIL DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE ÉLECTRIQUE, ET CIRCUIT INTÉGRÉ À SEMICONDUCTEUR[2016/41]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2016Translation filed 
27.05.2016National basic fee paid 
27.05.2016Search fee paid 
27.05.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
24.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/48]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
05.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011304390  (HUANG MING-CHUNG [TW]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0023] - [0061]; figures 3,4 *
 [X]US2002097811  (KUBO TOKURO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] - [0031] - [0051] - [0087]; figures 1,12A,12B *
 JP2003520478  [ ]
 JP2009284313  [ ]
 JP2007200378  [ ]
 JP2001308724  [ ]
 [X]JP2006333445  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)
 [A]JPH11177470  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.)