Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3079262 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3079262



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 311
31.10.2018 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
31.10.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
12.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2018 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 3
28.09.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.09.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.09.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
28.09.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 38
11.07.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.07.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
26.04.2018 Description Search / examination 28
26.04.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.04.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
13.03.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
13.03.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
18.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
18.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.09.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.05.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.05.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
24.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
24.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
28.10.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.10.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 5
28.10.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.10.2016 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
19.10.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
14.09.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
21.06.2016 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
27.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
27.05.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
27.05.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
27.05.2016 Description Search / examination 28
27.05.2016 Drawings Search / examination 7
27.05.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.04.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.06.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 31