Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3079262


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.10.2018 Withdrawal of application published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
08.10.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.09.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.07.2018 Change - representative
08.05.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
23.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.01.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.09.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.09.2017 First examination report
07.06.2017 Amendment by applicant
10.02.2017 Change - extension states published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
29.10.2016 Supplementary search report published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
28.10.2016 Change - classification published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
28.10.2016 Change - classification published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
10.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.09.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
09.09.2016 Request for examination filed published on  12.10.2016  [2016/41]
13.07.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
22.06.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
01.06.2016 Amendment by applicant
01.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.05.2016 Change - representative
31.05.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.2015 PCT data prior to European publication