Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2754520

EP2754520 - Pull saw for making mitre cuts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.06.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.07.2015  [2015/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bader, Manfred
Maria-Schlegel-Str. 3
88353 Kisslegg-Immenried / DE
[2014/29]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/29]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt
Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau/B. / DE
[2014/29]
Application number, filing date14000062.109.01.2014
[2014/29]
Priority number, dateDE2013100033911.01.2013         Original published format: DE102013000339
[2014/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2754520
Date:16.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B23D47/02, B23D45/02
[2014/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zugsäge zur Anbringung eines Gehrungsschnitts[2014/29]
English:Pull saw for making mitre cuts[2014/29]
French:Scie à tirer pour coupes d'onglets[2014/29]
Examination procedure09.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
17.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/30]
24.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/30]
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE7906841U  (BIEDRON, RALF) [X] 1,3,5,6,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,7,8;
 [XA]DE3026687  (STRAHL FRANZ NIKOLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,6-8