Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757596

EP2757596 - Method for solar cell manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/30]Solar cell and method for manufacturing the same
[2016/20]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu
Seoul, 150-721 / KR
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Yang, Dohwan
LG Electronics INC. IP Group,
16, Woomyeon-Dong
Seocho-Gu
137-724 Seoul / KR
02 / Yang, Juhong
LG Electronics INC. IP Group, 16, Woomyeon-Dong
Seocho-Gu
137-724 Seoul / KR
03 / Jung, Ilhyoung
LG Electronics INC. IP Group, 16, Woomyeon-Dong
Seocho-Gu
137-724 Seoul / KR
04 / Kim, Jinah
LG Electronics INC. IP Group, 16, Woomyeon-Dong
Seocho-Gu
137-724 Seoul / KR
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2016/39]
Former [2014/30]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14000128.014.01.2014
[2014/30]
Priority number, dateKR2013000493516.01.2013         Original published format: KR 20130004935
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2757596
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2757596
Date:11.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2757596
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/18, H01L31/068
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
Former [2014/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Solarzellenherstellung[2016/20]
English:Method for solar cell manufacturing[2016/20]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une cellule solaire[2016/20]
Former [2014/30]Solarzelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung
Former [2014/30]Solar cell and method for manufacturing the same
Former [2014/30]Cellule solaire et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure14.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
10.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2016Fee for grant paid
17.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2015
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
MT14.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IE14.01.2017
LU14.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
LU14.01.2017
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2012032310  (ENGELHART PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 3,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0015]; figures 1-4; claims 1,11 *;
 [A]US2009227095  (BATEMAN NICHOLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] - [0 41] , [0 55]; figure 4 *
 [XYI]  S. GALL ET AL, "High Quality Passivation Scheme Combined with Laser Doping from SiN:P and SiN:B Layer for Silicon Solar Cell", ENERGY PROCEDIA, (20120503), vol. 27, doi:10.1016/j.egypro.2012.07.095, ISSN 1876-6102, pages 467 - 473, XP055159896 [X] 1,2,5-8,12,15 * page 468, paragraphs 1-3 * * Sections 3.3 and 4 * [Y] 3,13 [I] 4,9-11,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.egypro.2012.07.095
ExaminationWO2013000026
    GALL S ET AL, "Evaluation of N-rich, P and B containing SiNx materials as passivation layer for silicon solar cell", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 26TH EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, HAMBURG, GERMANY, CONFERENCE 5 - 9 SEPTEMBER 2011, (20110905), ISBN 978-3-936338-27-0, pages 1648 - 1652, XP040637431
    BOCK R ET AL, "Back-junction back-contact n-type silicon solar cells with screen-printed aluminum-alloyed emitter", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (20100628), vol. 96, no. 26, doi:10.1063/1.3456536, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 263507-1 - 263507-3, XP012131787

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3456536
    REICHEL C ET AL, "Decoupling charge carrier collection and metallization geometry of back-contacted back-junction silicon solar cells by using insulating thin films", 35TH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE (PVSC), 20-25 JUNE 2010, HONOLULU, HI, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100620), ISBN 978-1-4244-5890-5, pages 1034 - 1038, XP031784356