Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2899207

EP2899207 - New method for testing HCV protease inhibition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.07.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amikana.Biologics
Avenue Jean Moulin
Faculté de Médecine de la Timone
13005 Marseille / FR
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Gluschankof, Pablo
18 rue des Petites Maries
13001 Marseille / FR
02 / Perrin-East, Christèle
87 boulevard de la Concorde
13009 Marseille / FR
 [2015/31]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/31]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date14000305.428.01.2014
[2015/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2899207
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/81, C07K14/005, C12Q1/02, C12Q1/37
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Neues Verfahren zum Testen von HCV-Proteasehemmung[2015/31]
English:New method for testing HCV protease inhibition[2015/31]
French:Nouveau procédé pour tester l'inhibition de la protéase du HCV[2015/31]
Examination procedure30.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/31]
10.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]  GAL-TANAMY M ET AL, "HCV NS3 Serine Protease-neutralizing Single-chain Antibodies Isolated by a Novel Genetic Screen", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, (20050415), vol. 347, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.JMB.2005.02.020, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 991 - 1003, XP004797676 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2005.02.020
 [A]  HYUN LEE ET AL, "High-Throughput Screening (HTS) and Hit Validation to Identify Small Molecule Inhibitors with Activity against NS3/4A proteases from Multiple Hepatitis C Virus Genotypes", PLOS ONE, (20131009), vol. 8, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0075144, ISSN 1932-6203, page e75144, XP055113743 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0075144
 [A]  BOONE C ET AL, "Yeast killer toxin: Site-directed mutations implicate the precursor protein as the immunity component", CELL, CELL PRESS, US, vol. 46, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0092-8674(86)90864-0, ISSN 0092-8674, (19860704), pages 105 - 113, (19860704), XP023883998 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(86)90864-0
 [A]  GERDES KENN ET AL, "Prokaryotic toxin-antitoxin stress response loci", NATURE REVIEWS. MICROBIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20050501), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1038/NRMICRO1147, ISSN 1740-1526, pages 371 - 382, XP009106994 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro1147
 [A]  J.-H. PARK ET AL, "Intramolecular Regulation of the Sequence-Specific mRNA Interferase Activity of MazF Fused to a MazE Fragment with a Linker Cleavable by Specific Proteases", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20120601), vol. 78, no. 11, doi:10.1128/AEM.00364-12, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 3794 - 3799, XP055113738 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.00364-12
by applicantWO2012049688
 WO2012040167
 WO2011049908
 WO2011005646
 WO2010132163
 WO2010017432
 WO2009076173
 WO2009085978
 WO2009076166
 WO2009053828
 WO2009152051
 WO2009134987
 WO2009120783
 WO2009117594
 WO2009094443
 WO2009094438
 WO2009079353
 WO2009079352
 WO2009073719
 WO2009073713
 WO2009070692
 WO2009070689
 WO2009064975
 WO2009064955
 WO2008134398
 WO2008134397
 WO2008134395
 WO2008106058
 WO2008002200
 WO2008021960
 WO2008021956
 WO2008021871
 WO2007146695
 WO2007089618
 WO2007143694
 WO2006130554
 WO2006086381
 WO2006039488
 WO2005113581
 WO2005077969
 WO2005073216
 WO2005037860
 WO2004113365
 WO2004093798
 WO2004092161
 WO2004072243
 WO03087092
 WO03066103
 WO03035060
 WO03006490
 WO0218369
 WO0208244
 WO0009558
 WO0009543
 WO9964442
 WO9907733
 WO9907734
 WO9950230
 WO9846630
 WO9817679
 WO9743310
    CHOO, PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1991), vol. 88, pages 2451 - 2455,
    KATO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A, (1990), vol. 87, pages 9524 - 9528,
    TAKAMIZAWA ET AL., J. VIRAL., (1991), vol. 65, pages 1105 - 1113,
    BARTENSCHLAGER ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 3835 - 3844,
    GRAKOUI ET AL., J. VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 2832 - 2843,
    GRAKOUI ET AL., J VIROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 1385 - 1395,
    TOMEI ET AL., J VITROL., (1993), vol. 67, pages 4017 - 4026,
    LIN ET AL., J. VIROL., (1994), vol. 68, pages 8147 - 8157,
    BOSTIAN, CELL, (1984), vol. 36, pages 741 - 751,
    SCHMITT; TIPPER, VIROLOGY, (1995), vol. 213, pages 341 - 351,
    MAYA ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. LETT., (2008), vol. 30, pages 979 - 987,
    GUARENTE ET AL., PROC.NTAL.ACAD.SCI., (1982), vol. 79, pages 7410 - 7414,
    GAR! ET AL., YEAST, (1997), vol. 13, pages 837 - 848,