Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2797398

EP2797398 - Loading head for populating substrates with electrical components by means of a pneumatic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MIMOT GmbH
Berner Weg 11
79539 Lörrach / DE
[2015/50]
Former [2014/44]For all designated states
MIMOT GmbH
Im Entenbad 13
79541 Lörrach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mehdianpour, Mohammad
Heltauer Str. 39
81829 München / DE
02 / Steiger, Daniel
Kirchmättle 25/1
79400 Kandern-Tannenkirch / DE
 [2018/25]
Former [2014/44]01 / Mehdianpour, Mohammad
Heltauer Str. 39
81829 München / DE
02 / Steiger, Daniel
Kirchmättle 25/1
79400 Kandern-Tannenkirch / DE
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2018/25]
Former [2014/44]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14000374.031.01.2014
[2014/44]
Priority number, dateDE2013100706823.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013007068
[2014/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2797398
Date:29.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2797398
Date:18.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2797398
Date:20.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05K13/04, B65G47/91, H01L21/683, B25J15/06
[2015/12]
Former International [2014/44]H05K13/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Former [2014/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bestückkopf zum Bestücken von Substraten mit elektrischen Bauelementen mittels einer pneumatischen Einrichtung[2014/44]
English:Loading head for populating substrates with electrical components by means of a pneumatic device[2014/44]
French:Tête d'implantation destinée à l'implantation de substrats avec des composants électriques au moyen d'un dispositif pneumatique[2014/44]
Examination procedure18.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
08.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2018Fee for grant paid
07.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2018
Opposition(s)21.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
ES20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
IT20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
LU31.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
ES20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
IT20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
MC20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/37]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
ES20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
IT20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/26]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
ES20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
IT20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
ES20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
IT20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
IT20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
PL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
NO20.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2012080064  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0028] - [0069]; figures 1-6 * * the whole document * [I] 6;
 [XI]JPH07297594  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 6;
 [A]EP0315161  (IBM DEUTSCHLAND [DE]; IBM [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10341046  (SMC CORP [JP]) [A] 6 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2012014467