Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813163

EP2813163 - Set of pre-packed ground coffee pods for a coffee machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Espressocap S.p.A.
Via Magenta 41/43
20010 Bareggio (MI) / IT
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Doria, Alessandro
Via F. Sforza 43
I - 20147 Milano MI / IT
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Leucci, Lidia
Studio Porsia
Vico S. Giorgio 1/2 scala destra
16128 Genova / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Natali, Dario
Innova & Partners S.r.l.
Via Cola di Rienzo 265
00192 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date14000829.305.07.2011
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateIT2011GE0002915.03.2011         Original published format: IT GE20110029
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813163
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/36, A47J31/46, A47J31/52
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Satz von vorgepackten gemahlenen Kaffeepads für eine Kaffeemaschine[2014/51]
English:Set of pre-packed ground coffee pods for a coffee machine[2014/51]
French:Ensemble de cartouches de café moulu pré-emballés pour une machine à café[2014/52]
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/51]
10.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11749333.8  / EP2685873
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110749333) is  01.12.2014
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
16.10.2014Request for further processing filed
16.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.11.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
16.10.2014Request for further processing filed
16.10.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.11.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
17.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
10.03.201403   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.2014
31.07.201606   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2017
31.07.201808   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3975996  (VITOUS CHARLES J) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 31 - line 51 * * column 3, line 18 - line 22; figures 2,3; claim - *;
 [XAI]US2009007793  (GLUCKSMAN DOV Z [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0014] , [0029] , [0032] , [0033] , [0053] , [0067] - [0070]; figures 4,5; claim - * [A] 3-5 [I] 2
by applicantEP1723047
 WO2011069829