Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809080

EP2809080 - Microspeaker with improved soldering structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Em-tech. Co., Ltd.
No. 401, Engineering-Bldg. Busan National University San 30, Jangjeon-dong Geumjeong-gu
Busan 609-390 / KR
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Jeong, In Ho
403-401 Gaenari 4cha Apt. Namyang-dong
Changwon-si
641-756 Gyeongsangnam-do / KR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2016/19]
Former [2014/49]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14001116.426.03.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateKR2013006007428.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130060074
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809080
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809080
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04R1/00, H04R9/02, H04R31/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Mikrolautsprecher mit verbesserter Lötstruktur[2014/49]
English:Microspeaker with improved soldering structure[2014/49]
French:Micro haut-parleur avec structure de soudage améliorée[2014/49]
Examination procedure23.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/08]
23.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2016Fee for grant paid
23.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2015
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2014
AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU26.03.2014
AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/46]AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2018/01]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012157888  (EM TECH CO LTD [KR]; KWON JOONG HAK [KR]; KIM CHEON MYEONG [KR]; KIM J) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-5;
 [I]US2013016874  (HUANG XING-ZHI [CN] ET AL) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [I]KR20100121771  (SUNG JU SOUND CORP [KR]) [I] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011243371  (XU TONG-MING [CN]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]KR20110002370  (BUJEON ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003013330  (TAKEUCHI SHINOBU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 9,12 *;
 [A]US3980367  (LASERSON GREGORY L ET AL) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *