Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801456

EP2801456 - Surface structuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VD Werkstätten GmbH & Co. KG
Am Hasselbruch 3
32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE
[2016/26]
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
VD Werkstätten GmbH & Co. KG
Am Hasselbruch 3
32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vietmeyer, Thomas
Drosselweg 9
32105 Bad Salzuflen / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/26]
Former [2014/46]Holland, Ralf , et al
Eikel & Partner GbR
Anwaltskanzlei
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 107
32760 Detmold / DE
Application number, filing date14001148.728.03.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateDE2013100765506.05.2013         Original published format: DE102013007655
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801456
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801456
Date:29.06.2016
Language:DE
[2016/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:B27D1/00, B27D5/00, B32B21/02, B32B21/04, B32B21/13, B32B21/14, B32B3/30, B44C5/04
[2016/13]
Former International [2014/46]B27D5/00, B32B21/04, B32B3/30, B44C5/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren der Oberflächenstrukturierung[2014/46]
English:Surface structuring method[2014/46]
French:Procédé de structuration de surface[2014/46]
Examination procedure04.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/24]
05.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2016Fee for grant paid
19.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2016
Opposition(s)30.03.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.03.2014
AL29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MT29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL29.06.2016
CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MT29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
MT29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
Former [2018/13]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
IE28.03.2017
LU28.03.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
LU28.03.2017
Former [2018/01]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
MC29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/45]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SI29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
BG29.09.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
ES29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
SM29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
PT31.10.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
PL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
SK29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
IS29.10.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ29.06.2016
EE29.06.2016
FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
IT29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RO29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/52]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
NL29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
SE29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/51]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
GR30.09.2016
Former [2016/50]FI29.06.2016
HR29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
LV29.06.2016
RS29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Former [2016/49]FI29.06.2016
LT29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Former [2016/46]LT29.06.2016
NO29.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2013050910  (UNILIN BVBA [BE]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] * * figure 3 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]DE202004014293U  (GLUNZ AG [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] *;
 [X]WO2006087155  (MAFI HOLZVERARBEITUNGSGES M B [AT], et al) [X] 1-3 * claim 3 * * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 1, line 17 - line 24 * * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 6 * * page 2, line 24 - line 27 *;
 [XP]EP2644338  (VD WERKSTAETTEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * claims 2,3 *;
 [A]EP2535155  (MAFI NATURHOLZBODEN GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2720478  (HOGG JAMES H) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [E]DE202013011776U  (VD WERKSTÄTTEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2004035263