Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789596

EP2789596 - Production of high purity, dense silicon carbide sintered body and sintered body obtained in such a manner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.03.2019  [2019/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FCT Ingenieurkeramik GmbH
Gewerbepark 11
96528 Rauenstein / DE
[2017/47]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
FCT Hartbearbeitungs GmbH
Hönbacher Straße 5
96515 Sonneberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Martin, Walter
Hönbacher Straße 5
96515 Sonneberg / DE
02 / Wötting, Gerhard, Dr.
Hönbacher Straße 5
96515 Sonneberg / DE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Weihrauch, Frank , et al
Dr. Weihrauch & Haussingen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neundorfer Strasse 2
98527 Suhl / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date14001173.528.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateDE2013100611810.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013006118
[2014/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789596
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/575, C04B35/571
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Herstellung hochreiner, dichter Siliziumcarbid-Sinterkörper und so erhältliche Sinterkörper[2014/42]
English:Production of high purity, dense silicon carbide sintered body and sintered body obtained in such a manner[2014/42]
French:Fabrication d'un corps fritté en carbure de silicium dense à pureté élevée, et corps fritté ainsi obtenu[2014/42]
Examination procedure10.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
01.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/10]
14.09.2018Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3500962  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * example 1 *;
 [Y]US4564490  (OMORI MAMORU [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-8 * example 48 *;
 [Y]DE10132505  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * claims 1,2,10 *
 [Y]  - MOHAMMAD ESFEHANIAN ET AL, "Development of Dense Filler-Free Polymer-Derived SiOC Ceramics by Field-Assisted Sintering", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (20081101), vol. 91, no. 11, doi:10.1111/j.1551-2916.2008.02730.x, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 3803 - 3805, XP055126141 [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1551-2916.2008.02730.x
by applicantWO2010007170
 EP2487144
 EP2075232
 US2011148011
    - ESFEHANIAN ET AL., "nDevelopment of Dense Filler-Free Polymer-Derived SiOC Ceramics by Field-Assisted Sintering", J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (2008), vol. 91, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1551-2916.2008.02730.x, pages 3803 - 3805, XP055126141

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1551-2916.2008.02730.x
    - "Ferrosilicochromium-Filled Polymer-Derived Ceramics", INT. J. APPL. CERAM. TECHNO!., (2011), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 1509 - 1516
    - ZHANG ET AL., "Synthesis and Characterization of Silicon Oxycarbide Glassesu", J. AM. CERAM. SOC., (1990), vol. 73, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1151-2916.1990.tb05143.x, pages 958 - 63, XP000138102

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1151-2916.1990.tb05143.x
    - HURWITZ ET AL., "Characterizatlon of the pyrolytic conversion of polysilsesquioxanes to silicon oxycarbides", J. OF MATERIALS 5CIENCE, (1993), vol. 28, pages 6622 - 6630
    - ROUXEL ET AL., "High Temperature Behavior of Gel-Derived SiOC Glass: Elasticity and Viscosity", J. OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 14, pages 87 - 94
    - J. KOBLER, "Fracture Toughness of Ceramics using SEVNB Method: Round Robin", VAMAS REPORT NR. 37