Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789723

EP2789723 - Method for wet treatment, in particular for washing, of laundry [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): RO
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Herbert Kannegiesser GmbH
Kannegiesserring 7
32602 Vlotho / DE
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Bringewatt, Wilhelm
Füllenkamp 5
32457 Porta Westfalica / DE
02 / Heinz, Engelbert
Bretthorststraße 272
32602 Vlotho / DE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Möller, Friedrich , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
[2017/43]
Former [2014/42]Möller, Friedrich , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Hollerallee 73
28209 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date14001190.931.03.2014
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateDE2013100620011.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013006200
[2014/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789723
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789723
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:D06F31/00, D06F39/00
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/17]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Nassbehandeln, vorzugsweise Waschen, von Wäsche[2014/42]
English:Method for wet treatment, in particular for washing, of laundry[2014/42]
French:Procédé de traitement humide, de préférence de lavage, de linge[2014/42]
Examination procedure12.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/17]
24.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2017Fee for grant paid
29.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2017
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2018/40]
Former [2018/37]CY25.10.2017
CZ25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
SM25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
RS25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NL25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL25.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0287761  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * columns 6,12,13; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE102011015188  (KANNEGIESSER H GMBH CO [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0042] , [0072]; figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9504128  (REINIGINGSTECHNIEKEN TNO [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 17; claim - *