Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801856

EP2801856 - Optical image stabilizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kamakura Koki Co., Ltd
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi, Saitama / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Ando, Kunio
1-9-1-1904 Kamiochiai
Chuo-ku
Saitama-shi
Saitama / JP
02 / Kato, Masashi
c/o Kamakura Koki Co.,Ltd.
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi
Saitama / JP
03 / Ito, Haruo
225-7 Araichou
Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa / JP
04 / Miyaji, Kazuya
c/o Kamakura Koki Co.,Ltd.
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi
Saitama / JP
 [2018/22]
Former [2015/02]01 / Ando, Kunio
1-9-1-1904 Kamiochiai
Chuo-ku
Saitama-shi
Saitama / JP
02 / Kato, Masashi
c/o Kamakura Koki Co.,Ltd.
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi
Saitama / JP
03 / Ito, Haruo
225-7 Araichou
Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa / JP
04 / Miyayi, Kazuya
c/o Kamakura Koki Co.,Ltd.
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi
Saitama / JP
Former [2014/46]01 / Ando, Kunio
1-9-1-1904 Kamiochiai,
Chuo-ku
Saitama-shi
Saitama / JP
02 / Kato, Masashi
c/o Kamakura Koki Co.,Ltd.
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi
Saitama / JP
03 / Ito, Haruo
225-7 Araichou
Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa / JP
04 / Miyayi, Kazuya
c/o Kamakura Koki Co.,Ltd.
3-6-12 Tsukagoshi
Warabi-shi
Saitama / JP
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date14001464.824.04.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateJP2013009123324.04.2013         Original published format: JP 2013091233
JP2013021537216.10.2013         Original published format: JP 2013215372
JP2014003762928.02.2014         Original published format: JP 2014037629
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801856
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801856
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/64, G02B23/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optischer Bildstabilisator[2014/46]
English:Optical image stabilizer[2014/46]
French:Stabilisateur d'image optique[2014/46]
Examination procedure28.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
04.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2018Fee for grant paid
06.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)01.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SI30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
IT30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
SM30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT30.05.2018
CY30.05.2018
CZ30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
PL30.05.2018
RO30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
SK30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/09]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
EE30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/08]CY30.05.2018
DK30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2019/03]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
NL30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/52]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
GR31.08.2018
Former [2018/51]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
LV30.05.2018
RS30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/50]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
HR30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/49]CY30.05.2018
ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
SE30.05.2018
BG30.08.2018
NO30.08.2018
Former [2018/47]ES30.05.2018
FI30.05.2018
LT30.05.2018
NO30.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US5978137  (TAKAHASHI KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 2 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 40 *;
 [A]JPH04104666  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 *;
 [A]US2009052037  (WERNERSSON MATS GORAN HENRY [SE]) [A] 1-18 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US2005248661  (STANVELY DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 4B *;
 [A]JPH07318866  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5852749  (KONNO NORIKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure 2 *
by applicantJPS5737852
 US4235506
 JPH06250100
 JPH0743645
 JPH1020213