Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799346

EP2799346 - Gas pressure testing device for a gas compartment portion of a bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyo Jidoki Co., Ltd.
18-6, Takanawa 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Toyo Jidoki Co., Ltd.
18-6, Takanawa 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshikane, Tohru
1808, Nagano, Ooaza
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi / JP
02 / Morishige, Shota
1808, Nagano, Ooaza
Iwakuni-shi, Yamaguchi / JP
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Schubert, Siegmar
Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel
Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date14001542.102.05.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateJP2013009703402.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013097034
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2799346
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799346
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65B31/04, B65B43/46, B65B61/00, G01M3/36
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gasdruckprüfvorrichtung für ein Gasbehälterteil eines Beutels[2014/45]
English:Gas pressure testing device for a gas compartment portion of a bag[2014/45]
French:Dispositif de test de pression de gaz pour une partie de compartiment à gaz d'un sac[2014/45]
Examination procedure04.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
05.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
26.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2016Fee for grant paid
02.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)01.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2014
AL31.08.2016
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CY31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
MT02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU02.05.2014
AL31.08.2016
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
MT02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/46]AL31.08.2016
AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
MT02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/43]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
MT02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/23]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
IE02.05.2017
LU02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/17]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU02.05.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
CH31.05.2017
LI31.05.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2018/06]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
MC31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/37]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SI31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/36]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
LU31.05.2017
Former [2017/32]AT31.08.2016
BE31.08.2016
CZ31.08.2016
EE31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
PL31.08.2016
RO31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
SK31.08.2016
SM31.08.2016
BG30.11.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
PT02.01.2017
Former [2017/13]AT31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
LV31.08.2016
NL31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT31.08.2016
FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
GR01.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI31.08.2016
HR31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
RS31.08.2016
SE31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI31.08.2016
LT31.08.2016
NO30.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT31.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4862732  (RAYMOND SAMUEL O [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-6 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 14; figures 3,5 *;
 [YD]JP4771785B  (-) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantJP4771785B
 JP5104073B