Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2799346 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2799346



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 216
05.07.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.09.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.07.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.06.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.04.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
18.04.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
09.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.03.2016 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.11.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.11.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
06.11.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.11.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
21.09.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.05.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
05.05.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
05.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
04.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
30.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
19.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
02.05.2014 Description Search / examination 21
02.05.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Drawings Search / examination 12
02.05.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8