Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2799346


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
23.03.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
05.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.02.2018  [2018/06]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
07.07.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
29.07.2016 (Expected) grant published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
15.07.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.06.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.06.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.04.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.11.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.09.2015 Change - classification published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
25.09.2015 Change - classification published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
15.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
15.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
07.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]