Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2799346 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410179925 EP14001542



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9625340Global Dossier 18.04.2017B2
US2014325938 06.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101911862BGlobal Dossier 25.10.2018B1
KR20140131255 12.11.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6084110BGlobal Dossier 22.02.2017B2
JP2014218262 20.11.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104129536BGlobal Dossier 12.04.2017B
CN104129536 05.11.2014A
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2799346Global Dossier 31.08.2016B1
EP2799346 05.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK2799346T 12.12.2016T3
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2590268T 21.11.2016T3
Priority number Date
JP2013097034 02.05.2013