Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813712

EP2813712 - Piston unit of a plunger cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BÜMACH ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL B.V.
Pioniersweg 15
7826 TA Emmen / NL
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Büter, Josef
Neue Industriestraße 1
D-49733 Haren/Altenberge / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Weihrauch, Frank , et al
Dr. Weihrauch & Haussingen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neundorfer Strasse 2
98527 Suhl / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date14001623.908.05.2014
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateDE20132005355U14.06.2013         Original published format: DE 202013005355 U
[2014/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813712
Date:17.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813712
Date:17.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F15B15/14
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/03]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kolbeneinheit eines Plungerzylinders[2014/51]
English:Piston unit of a plunger cylinder[2014/51]
French:Unité de piston d'un cylindre plongeur[2014/51]
Examination procedure03.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/16]
16.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.11.2017Fee for grant paid
28.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
07.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
GB08.05.2018
IE08.05.2018
LU08.05.2018
IS17.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
GB08.05.2018
IE08.05.2018
LU08.05.2018
IS17.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/19]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IE08.05.2018
LU08.05.2018
IS17.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
LU08.05.2018
IS17.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
DK17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
IT17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SE17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY17.01.2018
ES17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
FI17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
NO17.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]US3046949  (REGINALD REYNOLDS ET AL) [I] 1-5 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE9415543U  (HYDRAULIK TECHNIEK [NL]) [A] 1-4 * page 6, lines 9-21; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2661721  (THEO SHERWEN) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2821264  (ULINSKI BRONISLAUS I) [A] 1,4 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]DE102011009365  (STILL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]CH412625  (KIEKERT FRIEDRICH WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 *
by applicantDE9415543U