EP2803948 - Reference signal generation apparatus and reference signal generation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Akihide c/o Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/46] |
Former [2014/47] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14001665.0 | 12.05.2014 | [2014/47] | Priority number, date | JP20130103902 | 16.05.2013 Original published format: JP 2013103902 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2803948 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2803948 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2803948 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347, G01D5/38, G01D5/244, G01D5/36 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G01D5/24438 (EP,US);
G01D5/347 (US);
G01D5/366 (EP,US);
G01D5/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Referenzsignalerzeugungsvorrichtung und Referenzsignalerzeugungssystem | [2014/47] | English: | Reference signal generation apparatus and reference signal generation system | [2014/47] | French: | Appareil et système de génération de signal de référence | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 23.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2014 | AL | 16.11.2016 | AT | 16.11.2016 | BE | 16.11.2016 | CY | 16.11.2016 | CZ | 16.11.2016 | DK | 16.11.2016 | EE | 16.11.2016 | ES | 16.11.2016 | FI | 16.11.2016 | HR | 16.11.2016 | IT | 16.11.2016 | LT | 16.11.2016 | LV | 16.11.2016 | MC | 16.11.2016 | MK | 16.11.2016 | NL | 16.11.2016 | PL | 16.11.2016 | RO | 16.11.2016 | RS | 16.11.2016 | SE | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | SK | 16.11.2016 | SM | 16.11.2016 | TR | 16.11.2016 | BG | 16.02.2017 | NO | 16.02.2017 | GR | 17.02.2017 | IS | 16.03.2017 | PT | 16.03.2017 | IE | 12.05.2017 | LU | 12.05.2017 | MT | 12.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
TR | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
MK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CY | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AT | 16.11.2016 | ||
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
MT | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
IE | 12.05.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
MC | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
BG | 16.02.2017 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
IT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
SM | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
BE | 16.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
EE | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RO | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
SK | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
CZ | 16.11.2016 | ||
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
DK | 16.11.2016 | ||
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 16.11.2016 | |
ES | 16.11.2016 | ||
FI | 16.11.2016 | ||
HR | 16.11.2016 | ||
LT | 16.11.2016 | ||
LV | 16.11.2016 | ||
NL | 16.11.2016 | ||
PL | 16.11.2016 | ||
RS | 16.11.2016 | ||
SE | 16.11.2016 | ||
NO | 16.02.2017 | ||
GR | 17.02.2017 | ||
PT | 16.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 16.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH10332431 (MITUTOYO CORP) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [A]US6175414 (HOLZAPFEL WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * columns 5-7; claim 1 * | by applicant | JPH10332431 | JP2000304574 | JP2009515182 |