Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808423

EP2808423 - Dry etching method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]Dry etching method, dry etching apparatus, metal film, and device including the metal film
[2017/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Central Glass Company, Limited
5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi
Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP
[2017/31]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Central Glass Company, Limited
5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi
Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kikuchi, Akiou
c/o Central Glass Company, Ltd.
5253 Oaza Okiube
Ube City Yamaguchi, 755-0001 / JP
02 / Takeda, Yuta
c/o Central Glass Company, Ltd.
5253 Oaza Okiube
Ube City Yamaguchi, 755-0001 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2017/31]
Former [2014/49]Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date14001853.228.05.2014
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateJP2013011625031.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013116250
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808423
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808423
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:C23F1/12, C23F4/02, H01L21/3213
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Trockenätzverfahren[2017/10]
English:Dry etching method[2017/10]
French:Procédé de gravure sèche[2017/10]
Former [2014/49]Trockenätzverfahren, Trockenätzvorrichtung, Metallschicht, und Vorrichtung mit der Metallschicht
Former [2014/49]Dry etching method, dry etching apparatus, metal film, and device including the metal film
Former [2014/49]Procédé de gravure sèche, appareil de gravure sèche, film métallique et dispositif comprenant le film métallique
Examination procedure01.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
01.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2017
07.02.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2017Fee for grant paid
21.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
MC02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
[2019/06]
Former [2018/39]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SI02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
IT02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
SM02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
EE02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RO02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
SK02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT02.08.2017
CZ02.08.2017
DK02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
LV02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT02.08.2017
ES02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
PL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
BG02.11.2017
NO02.11.2017
GR03.11.2017
IS02.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.08.2017
FI02.08.2017
HR02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
RS02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
SE02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI02.08.2017
LT02.08.2017
NL02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT02.08.2017
NO02.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]JP2004039976  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [0 13] - [0015] - [0 21] , [0 23]; figures 1-2; examples 1-4 *;
 [ID]JP2012156259  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [ID] 1-3,7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0038] - [0041] - [0043] , [0051] - [0053]; claims 2,3,7 *;
 [IP]US2013306597  (GUNJI ISAO [JP] ET AL) [IP] 1-3,7-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0010] , [0040] , [0042] , [0044] , [0056] - [0058]; claims 2,3,7 *;
 [A]  - VIGATO P A ET AL, "The evolution of beta-diketone or beta-diketophenol ligands and related complexes", COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM [NL], vol. 253, no. 7-8, doi:10.1016/J.CCR.2008.07.013, ISSN 0010-8545, (200904), pages 1099 - 1201, (20080730), XP026004375 [A] 1 * page 1104, page 1107, chapter 4.1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2008.07.013
Examination   - JAIN A ET AL, "Thermal dry-etching of copper using hydrogen peroxide and hexafluoroacetylacetone", THIN SOLID FILMS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19951115), vol. 269, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0040-6090(95)06877-5, ISSN 0040-6090, pages 51 - 56, XP004000578

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(95)06877-5
    - FAHLMAN B. D., BARRON A. R, "Substituent Effects on the Volatility of Metal beta-diketonates", ADV. MATER. OPT. ELECTRON., (200010), vol. 10, no. 3-5, doi:10.1002/1099-0712(200005/10)10:3/5<223::AID-AMO411>3.0.CO;2-M, pages 223 - 232, XP055214591
by applicantJP2001176807
 JPH06101076
 JPH11140652
 JP2012156259
 JP2004091829