Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810562

EP2810562 - Method for obtaining an edible water-in-oil emulsion [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Hubert
13/15 Rue du Pont des Halles
94150 Rungis / FR
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Marchal, Norbert
32 rue du Chaufour
54 122 Flin / FR
02 / Ferrari, Audrey
3 allée de Bruxelles
54 500 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy / FR
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date14001914.203.06.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateFR2013000125303.06.2013         Original published format: FR 1301253
[2014/50]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810562
Date:10.12.2014
Language:FR
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810562
Date:30.01.2019
Language:FR
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:A23D7/005, A23D7/05
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Erhalten einer essbaren Wasser-Öl-Emulsion[2014/50]
English:Method for obtaining an edible water-in-oil emulsion[2014/50]
French:Procédé d'obtention d'une émulsion eau-dans-huile comestible[2014/50]
Examination procedure03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
23.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2018Fee for grant paid
11.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
23.06.2015Request for further processing filed
23.06.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.07.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
23.06.2015Request for further processing filed
23.06.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.07.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006039991  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * example 1 *;
 [XI]GB1261910  (UNILEVER LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,8-10 * examples 1-2 * [I] 7;
 [A]WO0064268  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 16, paragraph 5; example 1 *;
 [A]DE2245814  (ALFA LAVAL BERGEDORFER EISEN) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2014139762