Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811539

EP2811539 - Solar cell with multilayered structure and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/50]Solar cell with multilayered rear electrode structure and manufacturing method thereof
[2019/11]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Baek, Hayan
16 Woomyun-dong, Seocho-ku
137-724 Seoul / KR
02 / Choi, Junghoon
16 Woomyun-dong, Seocho-ku
137-724 Seoul / KR
03 / Shim, Goohwan
16 Woomyun-dong, Seocho-ku
137-724 Seoul / KR
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/32]
Former [2014/50]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14001935.704.06.2014
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateKR2013006478805.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130064788
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811539
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811539
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/18, H01L31/0224, H01L31/068
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:Solarzelle mit mehrschichtiger Elektrodenstructure und Herstellungsverfahren dafür[2019/11]
English:Solar cell with multilayered structure and manufacturing method thereof[2019/11]
French:Cellule solaire à électrode multicouche et son procédé de fabrication[2019/12]
Former [2014/50]Solarzelle mit mehrschichtiger Rückelektrodenstructure und Herstellungsverfahren dafür
Former [2014/50]Solar cell with multilayered rear electrode structure and manufacturing method thereof
Former [2014/50]Cellule solaire à électrode arrière moulticouche et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2019Fee for grant paid
12.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT07.08.2019
NO07.11.2019
[2020/08]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004200520  (MULLIGAN WILLIAM P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,13-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021]; figures 1-8 * [I] 4-7,12;
 [A]US2011041911  (LEE SUNGEUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0048] - [0056]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0056] , [0068] , [0 79] , [0080] , [0084] - [0090] - [0094] - [0096]; figures 3H-3K *;
 [A]US2011309508  (CABRAL JR CYRIL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0023] - [0026] - [0031] , [0032]; figures 1-4 *
ExaminationDE102011086302
 US2011272009