Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2811539 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2811539



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 265
19.08.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.07.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
12.06.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
12.06.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
26.02.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
26.02.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
26.02.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 45
08.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
08.08.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
08.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
08.08.2018 Description Search / examination 5
08.08.2018 Drawings Search / examination 2
08.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.08.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.04.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.04.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.01.2018 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.12.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
12.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
05.09.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
27.08.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
18.08.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
04.06.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Claims Search / examination 5
04.06.2014 Description Search / examination 34
04.06.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Drawings Search / examination 7
04.06.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8