Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2811539


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
07.02.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2020 [2020/11]
31.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2020 [2020/10]
24.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2020 [2020/09]
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
05.07.2019 (Expected) grant published on  07.08.2019  [2019/32]
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.06.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.06.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
25.02.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.02.2019 Change - French title published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Change - German title published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019 Change - English title published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019 Change - French title published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
10.08.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
30.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.04.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.04.2018 First examination report
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
09.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
07.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]