Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2779772

EP2779772 - Communication Control Apparatus, Communication Terminal Apparatus, Wireless Communication System, and Communication Method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.03.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[2015/39]
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
For all designated states
OSAKA UNIVERSITY
1-1, Yamadaoka
Suita-shi, Osaka 565-0871 / JP
For all designated states
National Institute of Information and Communications Technology
4-2-1, Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi
Tokyo 184-8795 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Namba, Hideo
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
02 / Kubota, Minoru
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
03 / Hamaguchi, Yasuhiro
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
04 / TO, Shimpei
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
05 / Sampei, Seiichi
c/o Osaka University 1-1
Yamadaoka
Suita-shi Osaka, 565-0871 / JP
06 / Harada, Hiroshi
c/o National Institute of Information and
Communications Technology
Int. Property Management Group
4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi
Koganei-shi Tokyo, 184-8795 / JP
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Müller - Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14002001.707.12.2007
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateJP2006033198308.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006331983
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2779772
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/18]
Former [2014/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssteuerungsvorrichtung, Kommunikationsendgerätevorrichtung, drahtloses Kommunikationssystem und Kommunikationsverfahren[2014/38]
English:Communication Control Apparatus, Communication Terminal Apparatus, Wireless Communication System, and Communication Method[2014/38]
French:Appareil de commande de communication, appareil terminal de communication, système de communication sans fil et procédé de communication[2014/38]
Examination procedure17.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
21.04.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07850265.5  / EP2094025
Request for further processing for:09.06.2015Request for further processing filed
09.06.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.07.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
22.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2005220002  (LI XIAODONG [US], et al) [I] 1,5,8,10,11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0099] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0114] * [Y] 2-4,6,7,9,12;
 [IY]US2004214582  (LAN CHEN [JP], et al) [I] 1,5,8,10,11,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0169] * * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0221] * [Y] 2-4,6,7,9,12;
 [A]EP1120986  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0031] *;
 [A]US2002147017  (LI XIAODONG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0071] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0109] *;
 [A]US5903843  (SUZUKI HIDEYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 56 - column 10, line 36 *;
 [A]GB2322522  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - page 5, line 23 * * page 6, line 6 - page 9, line 36 *
by applicantJP2005130491