Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818463

EP2818463 - Production method of 1,4-diazepane derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.02.2018  [2018/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kowa Co., Ltd.
6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 460-0003 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Gomi, Noriaki
c/o Kowa Co. Ltd., Tokyo New Drug Research
Laboratories, 2-17-43
Noguchi-cho
Higashimurayama-shi, Tokyo, 189-0022 / JP
02 / Ohgiya, Tadaaki
c/o Kowa Co. Ltd., Tokyo New Drug Research
Laboratories, 2-17-43
Noguchi-cho
Higashimurayama-shi, Tokyo, 189-0022 / JP
03 / Shibuya, Kimiyuki
c/o Kowa Co. Ltd., Tokyo New Drug Research
Laboratories, 2-17-43
Noguchi-cho
Higashimurayama-shi, Tokyo, 189-0022 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Blodig, Wolfgang
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date14002011.625.08.2011
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateJP2010018939226.08.2010         Original published format: JP 2010189392
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818463
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:C07D243/08
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für 1,4-diazepan derivate[2015/01]
English:Production method of 1,4-diazepane derivatives[2015/01]
French:Procédé de production de dérivés de 1,4-diazepane[2015/10]
Former [2015/01]procédé de production de dérivés de 1,4-diazepane
Examination procedure25.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
02.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/08]
11.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/08]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11819992.6  / EP2610252
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201707   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1803710  (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]) [I] 1-4,9,10,15 * reference example 19 *;
 [I]JP2007238458  (WESTERN THERAPEUTICS INST INC) [I] 1-4,9,10,15 * example 10 *
by applicantWO9920620
 WO2006057397
 WO9728130
 JP2006348028
 JP2006290827
    - Protective Groups in Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC.