Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2958267

EP2958267 - Communication network structure, method of interconnecting autonomous communication networks and computer program implementing said method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Defence and Space Limited
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB
[2019/36]
Former [2016/01]For all designated states
Airbus Defence and Space Limited
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Taylor, Stuart
9 St. Thomas Drive, Pagham, Bognor 'Regis
West Sussex, PO21 4UB / GB
02 / Archer, Tamzin
c/o Paradigm Ltd., Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2AS / GB
 [2015/52]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2019/36]
Application number, filing date14002102.318.06.2014
[2015/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2958267
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2958267
Date:04.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24
[2015/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/52]
TitleGerman:Kommunikationsnetzstruktur, Verfahren zum Verbinden von autonomen Kommunikationsnetzen und Computerprogramm zur Umsetzung dieses Verfahrens[2015/52]
English:Communication network structure, method of interconnecting autonomous communication networks and computer program implementing said method[2015/52]
French:Structure de réseau de communication, procédé d'interconnexion de réseaux de communication autonome et programme informatique mettant en oeuvre ledit procédé[2015/52]
Examination procedure23.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/32]
24.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2019Fee for grant paid
25.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201906   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2019
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLT04.09.2019
NO04.12.2019
[2020/08]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2010246443  (COHN DANIEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0072] * * figure 1 *;
 [X]WO03023636  (WORLDSPAN L P [US]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [XA]EP1780943  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0051] * [A] 5,6;
 [A]US2011110268  (PANASYUK ANATOLIY [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *