Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2960862

EP2960862 - A method for stabilizing vital sign measurements using parametric facial appearance models via remote sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/01]A method for stabilizing vital sign measurements using parametric facial appearance models via remote sensors
[2016/22]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.10.2017 [2017/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vicarious Perception Technologies B.V.
Singel 160
1015 AH Amsterdam / NL
[2016/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Tasli, H. Emrah
Singel 160
1015 AH Amsterdam / NL
02 / Gudi, Amogh
Singel 160
1015 AH Amsterdam / NL
03 / Ivan, Paul
Singel 160
1015 AH Amsterdam / NL
04 / Uyl, Marten den
Singel 160
1015 AH Amsterdam / NL
 [2016/01]
Representative(s)Karaahmet, Erdogan
Yalciner Patent and Consulting Ltd.
Tunus Cad. 85/3-4
Kavaklidere
Cankaya
06680 Ankara / TR
[2017/12]
Former [2016/01]Karaahmet, Erdogan
Tunus Cad. 85/3-4
Kavaklidere
Cankaya
06680 Ankara / TR
Application number, filing date14002150.224.06.2014
[2016/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2960862
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2960862
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP08.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/20, A61B5/024
[2016/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Stabilisierung von Lebenszeichenmessungen unter Verwendung parametrischer Physiognomiemodelle über Fernsensoren[2016/26]
English:A method for stabilizing vital sign measurements using parametric facial appearance models via remote sensors[2016/26]
French:Procédé de stabilisation des mesures de signes vitaux utilisant des modèles d'apparence faciale paramétrique via des capteurs à distance[2016/26]
Former [2016/01]Verfahren und System zur Stabilisierung von Lebenszeichenmessungen unter Verwendung parametrischer Physiognomiemodelle über Fernsensoren
Former [2016/01]A method for stabilizing vital sign measurements using parametric facial appearance models via remote sensors
Former [2016/01]Procédé et système de stabilisation des mesures de signes vitaux utilisant des modèles d'apparence faciale paramétrique via des capteurs à distance
Examination procedure09.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.11.2015Examination requested  [2015/53]
03.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
06.02.2017Fee for grant paid
06.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
06.02.2017Request for further processing filed
06.02.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.02.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
[2017/41]
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004039273  (TERRY ALVIN MARK [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0073] *
 [A]  - DRAGOS DATCU ET AL, "Noncontact automatic heart rate analysis in visible spectrum by specific face regions", COMPUTER SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20130628), doi:10.1145/2516775.2516805, ISBN 978-1-4503-2021-4, pages 120 - 127, XP058034178 [A] 1 * page 121 - page 124 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2516775.2516805
by applicantWO2009040711
 WO2012143842
 WO2013128345
 WO2012020365
 US2013184517
 WO2011060220
 US2014088433
 WO2013186696
 WO2013156908
 US2011251493
    - W. VERKRUYSSE; L. O. SVAASAND; J. S. NELSON, "Remote plethysmographic imaging using ambient light", OPTICS EXPRESS, (200812),
    - M. Z. POH; D. J. MCDUFF; R. W. PICARD, "Non-contact, automated cardiac pulse measurements using video imaging and blind source separation", OPT EXPRESS, (20100507),
    - G. J. EDWARDS; C. J TAYLOR; T. F. COOTES, "Interpreting face images using active appearance models", PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTOMATIC FACE AND GESTURE RECOGNITION, (1998),
    - P. VIOLA; M. JONES, "Robust Real-time Object Detection", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (2001),
    - M. J. DEN UYL; H. VAN KULLENBURG, "The FaceReader: Online facial expression recognition", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON METHODS AND TECHNIQUES IN BEHAVIOURAL RESEARCH, (2005),
    - H. VAN KUILENBURG; M. WIERING; M.J. DEN UYL, "A Model Based Method for Automatic Facial Expression Recognition", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON MACHINE LEARNING (ECML, (2005),