Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2848329

EP2848329 - Method and device for precision cutting of workpieces in a press [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WEBO Werkzeugbau Oberschwaben GmbH
Hummelau 3
88279 Amtzell / DE
[2015/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Ziesel, Norbert
Singenberg 29
88279 Amtzell / DE
02 / Wittig, Axel
Faustin-Mennel-Str. 24
88239 Roggenzell / DE
 [2015/12]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/12]
Application number, filing date14002380.510.07.2014
[2015/12]
Priority number, dateDE2013101518011.09.2013         Original published format: DE102013015180
[2015/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2848329
Date:18.03.2015
Language:DE
[2015/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2848329
Date:14.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:B21D45/00, B21D28/16
[2015/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2015/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Präzisionsschneiden von Werkstücken in einer Presse[2015/12]
English:Method and device for precision cutting of workpieces in a press[2015/12]
French:Procédé et dispositif de coupe de précision de pièces à usiner dans une presse[2015/12]
Examination procedure20.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
27.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2017Fee for grant paid
24.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.07.2014
CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MT14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE10.07.2017
LU10.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
MT14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE10.07.2017
LU10.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SI14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE10.07.2017
LU10.07.2017
BE31.07.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE10.07.2017
LU10.07.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/23]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
IE10.07.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ14.06.2017
DK14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/18]CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
MC14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
ES14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
IT14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
PL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
SM14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
IS14.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ14.06.2017
EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RO14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
SK14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE14.06.2017
FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
NL14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
LV14.06.2017
RS14.06.2017
SE14.06.2017
BG14.09.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI14.06.2017
HR14.06.2017
LT14.06.2017
NO14.09.2017
GR15.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO8702916  (AEW AUTOMAT ELEKTROGE WERKZEUG [AT]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * [A] 5,10;
 [XI]WO2009002176  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,9,10 * abstract * [I] 4-8;
 [XA]DE1552049  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG) [X] 1-4,6-9 * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,10;
 [XA]US3211034  (RAIMUND ANDRIS) [X] 1-4,6-9 * figure 6 * [A] 5,10
by applicantDE102005045454
 DE19908603
 EP0131770
 DD293752