Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808015

EP2808015 - Compositions comprising nebivolol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 03.10.2018  [2018/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC
781 Chesnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26504 / US
[2015/04]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
MYLAN LABORATORIES, INC
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, NV 26504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Davis, Eric
12 Cobun Ridge
Morgantown, WV 26508 / US
02 / O'Donnell, John
24 Heather Drive
Morgantown, WV 26505 / US
03 / Bottini, Peter Bruce
1460 Western Avenue
Morgantown, WV 26505 / US
04 / Mason, Preston
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26504 / US
05 / Shaw, Andrew Preston
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26504 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14002458.916.11.2005
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateUS2005014123531.05.2005         Original published format: US 141235
US2005027256210.11.2005         Original published format: US 272562
US2005027399215.11.2005         Original published format: US 273992
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808015
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/34, A61K31/502, A61K31/353, A61P9/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2014/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen mit Nebivolol[2014/49]
English:Compositions comprising nebivolol[2014/49]
French:Compositions comportant du nebivolol[2014/49]
Examination procedure02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
18.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2018
15.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/40]
25.05.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/40]
14.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05848185.4  / EP1890691
EP09015249.7  / EP2174658
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
16.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
23.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]  - GREMMLER B ET AL, "EFFECTS OF AT1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST THERAPY IN PATIENTS WITH SEVERE HEART FAILURE PRETREATED WITH ANGIOTENSIN-CONVERTING ENZYME INHIBITORS", EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL CARDIOLOGY, PULSUS GROUP, OAKVILLE, CA, (20030101), vol. 7, no. 4, ISSN 1205-6626, pages 193 - 198, XP009057410 [X] 1-6 * table 1 * * page 196, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 4 *
 [Y]  - COCCO G ET AL, "Effects of combined treatment with enalapril and losartan on myocardial function in heart failure", HEART, BMJ, LONDON, GB, (20020101), vol. 88, no. 2, doi:10.1136/HEART.88.2.185, ISSN 1355-6037, pages 185 - 186, XP002983203 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 185, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 186, column l, paragraph l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/heart.88.2.185
 [Y]  - FUNABIKI K ET AL, "1087-106 Synergistic effects of the addition of candesartan to enalapril on myocardial fibrosis and left ventricular diastolic function in dogs with heart failure", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 43, no. 5, ISSN 0735-1097, (20040303), page A188, (20040303), XP027352200 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - TEOH Y P ET AL, "CANDY IN THE CLINIC: RESISTANT HYPERTENSION IN DIABETES", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DIABETES AND VASCULAR DISEASE, MEDINEWS, GB, (20030101), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1474-6514, page 300/301, XP009057409 [Y] 1-6 * Introduction *
 [Y]  - MORTON T L ET AL, "Pharmacokinetics of nebivolol and ramipril are not affected by co-administration", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (20050201), vol. 77, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CLPT.2004.12.186, ISSN 0009-9236, page P77, XP004802607 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clpt.2004.12.186
 [Y]  - LAWRENCE T E ET AL, "No effect of concomitant administration of nebivolol and losartan in healthy volunteers genotyped for CYP2D6 status", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, US, (20050201), vol. 77, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.CLPT.2004.12.206, ISSN 0009-9236, page P82, XP004802627 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clpt.2004.12.206
by applicantUS6458819
 US5087634
 US4816463
 US5085992
 US5081127
 US5073566
 US5064825
 US4772684
 US4302386
 EP0253310
 US4105776
 US4316906
 US4374829
 US4344949
 US4587258
 US4508729
 US4512924
 US4410520
 US4337201
 US5440020
 WO9920110
 US6136804
 WO9641645
 WO9500501
 WO9518799
 US5474995
 US5543297
 US4444784
 US4231938
 US4346227
 US4739073
 US5273995
 US5622985
 US5135935
 US5356896
 US4920109
 US5286895
 US5262435
 US5260332
 US5317031
 US5283256
 US5256689
 US5182298
 US5369125
 US5302604
 US5166171
 US5202327
 US5276021
 US5196440
 US5091386
 US5091378
 US4904646
 US5385932
 US5250435
 US5132312
 US5130306
 US5116870
 US5112857
 US5102911
 US5098931
 US5081136
 US5025000
 US5021453
 US5017716
 US5001144
 US5001128
 US4997837
 US4996234
 US4994494
 US4992429
 US4970231
 US4968693
 US4963538
 US4957940
 US4950675
 US4946864
 US4946860
 US4940800
 US4940727
 US4939143
 US4929620
 US4923861
 US4906657
 US4906624
 US4897402
 US5116835
 US5114937
 US5106835
 US5104869
 US5095119
 US5098924
 US5095006
 US5089471
 US5075451
 US5066643
 US5063208
 US4845079
 US5055466
 US4980283
 US4885292
 US4780401
 US5071837
 US5064965
 US5063207
 US5036054
 US5036053
 US5034512
 US4894437
    - COCKCROFT JR; CHOWIENCZYK PJ; BRETT SE; CHEN CP; DUPONT AG; NUETEN LV; WOODING SJ; RITTER JM., JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, (1995), vol. 274, pages 1067 - 1071
    - TZEMOS N; LIM PO; MACDONALD TM., CIRCULATION, (2001), vol. 104, pages 511 - 514
    - BROEDERS MA; DOEVENDANS PA; BEKKERS BC; BRONSAER R; VAN GORSEL E; HEEMSKERK JW; EGBRINK MG; VAN BREDA E; RENEMAN RS; VAN DER ZEE R, CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 102, pages 677 - 684
    - BOWMAN, A.J.; CPL-H CHEN; GA FORD, BR. J. CLIN. PHARMAC., (1994), vol. 38, pages 199 - 204
    - KALINOWSKI L; DOBRUCKI LW; SZCZEPANSKA-KONKEL M; JANKOWSKI M; MARTYNIEC L; ANGIELSKI S; MALINSKI T., CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, pages 2747 - 2752
    - MOLLNAU H; SCHULZ E; DAIBER A; BALDUS S; OELZE M; AUGUST M; WENDT M; WALTER U; GEIGER C; AGRAWAL R, ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 23, pages 615 - 621
    - TROOST R; SCHWEDHELM E; ROJCZYK S; TSIKAS D; FROLICH JC., BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 50, pages 377 - 379
    - LONG ET AL., J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1988), vol. 247, no. 1, pages 1 - 7
    - FLECKENSTEIN, CIR. RES., (1983), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 13 - 16
    - MCCALL, D., CURR PRACT CARDIOL, (1985), vol. 10, pages 1 - 11
    - REMINGTON, The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, Nineteenth Edition,, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1995), page 963
    - T. PENNING, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of the 1,5-diarylpyrazole class of cyclooxygenase-2 inhibitors: identification of 4-[5-(4-methylphenyl)-3-(trifluoromethyl)-1H-pyrozol-1-yl]benzenesulfonami de (SC-58635, celecoxib", J. MED. CHEM., (19970425), vol. 40, no. 9, pages 1347 - 56
    - C. LANZO ET AL., "Fluorescence quenching analysis of the association and dissociation of a diarylheterocycle to cyclooxygenasel-1 and cyclooxygenase-2: dynamic basis of cycloxygenase-2 selectivity", BIOCHEMISTRY, (20000523), vol. 39, no. 20, pages 6228 - 34
    - J. TALLEY ET AL., "4,5-Diaryloxazole inhibitors of cyclooxygenase-2 (COX-2", MED. RES. REV., (199905), vol. 19, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/(SICI)1098-1128(199905)19:3<199::AID-MED1>3.0.CO;2-7, pages 199 - 208, XP001181971

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-1128(199905)19:3<199::AID-MED1>3.0.CO;2-7
    - "4-[5-Methyl-3-phenylisoxazol-1-yl]benzenesulfonamide, Valdecoxib: A Potent and Selective Inhibitor of COX-2", J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 775 - 777
    - "N-[[(5-methyl-3-phenylixoxazol-4yl)-phenyl]sulfonyl]propanimide, Sodium Salt, Parecoxib Sodium: A Potent and Selective Inhibitor of COX-2 for Parenteral Administration", J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 1661 - 1663
    - J. CARTER ET AL., "Synthesis and activity of sulfonamide-substituted 4,5-diaryl thiazoles as selective cyclooxygenase-2 inhibitors", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT, (19990419), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00157-2, pages 1171 - 74, XP004163989

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00157-2
    - "Design and synthesis of sulfonyl-substituted 4,5-diarylthiazoles as selective cyclooxygenase-2 inhibitors", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT, (19990419), vol. 9, no. 8, pages 1167 - 70
    - ATTIGA ET AL., "Inhibitors of Prostaglandin Synthesis Inhibit Human Prostate Tumor Cell Invasiveness and Reduce the Release of Matrix Metalloproteinases", CANCER RESEARCH, (20000815), vol. 60, pages 4629 - 4637, XP008100448
    - HSU ET AL., "The cyclooxygenase-2 inhibitor celecoxib induces apoptosis by blocking Akt activation in human prostate cancer cells independently of Bcl-2", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, no. 15, pages 11397 - 11403
    - MITCHELL ET AL., "Cyclo-oxygenase-2: pharmacology, physiology, biochemistry and relevance to NSAID therapy", BRIT. J. OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1999), vol. 128, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.bjp.0702897, pages 1121 - 1132, XP001031817

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0702897
    - L. JACKSON ET AL., "COX-2 Selective Nonsteroidal Anti-Inflammatory Drugs: Do They Really Offer Any Advantages?", DRUGS, (200006), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1207 - 1216
    - DEPIRO ET AL., Pharmacotherapy: A Pathophysiologic Approach, MCGRAW HILL, (1999), vol. 553
    - CHAURET ET AL., "In vitro metabolism considerations, including activity testing of metabolites, in the discovery and selection of the COX-2 inhibitor etoricoxib (MK-0663", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20010423), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 1059 - 62
    - YERGEY ET AL., DRUG METAB. DISPOS., (200105), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 638 - 44
    - ZHAO ET AL., "Significant Inhibition by the Flavonoid Antioxidant Silymarin against 12-0-tetracecanoylphorbol 13-acetate-caused modulation of antioxidant and inflammatory enzymes, and cyclooxygenase 2 and interleukin-1 alpha expression in SENCAR mouse epidermis: implications in the prevention of stage I tumor pro", MOL. CARCINOG., (199912), vol. 26, no. 4, pages 321 - 33
    - ENDRES M ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 8880 - 5
    - USDA-IOWA STATE UNIVERSITY DATABASE ON THE ISOFLAVONE CONTENT OF FOODS, RELEASE 1.3-2002, AND IN USDA DATABASE FOR THE FLAVONOID CONTENT OF SELECTED FOODS, (2003), URL: http://www.nal.usda. gov/fnic/foodcomp/Data/isoflav/isoflav.htrnl
    - MALINSKI T; TAHA Z., NATURE, (1992), vol. 358, pages 676 - 678
    - MALINSKI T; CZUCHAJOWSKI L., METHODS IN NITRIC OXIDE RESEARCH, (1996), pages 319 - 339