Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2919100

EP2919100 - Conductive film and touch panel including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/38]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Jihyun
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
02 / Choi, Yeontae
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
03 / Park, Jonggoo
19, Yangjae-daero 11gil, Seocho-gu
137-893 Seoul / KR
 [2015/38]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2015/38]
Application number, filing date14002581.824.07.2014
[2015/38]
Priority number, dateKR2014002788210.03.2014         Original published format: KR 20140027882
[2015/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2919100
Date:16.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2919100
Date:30.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/041, H05K1/18, H05K3/32
[2017/12]
Former International [2015/38]G06F3/041, H05K1/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/38]
TitleGerman:Leitfähiger Film und Berührungsbildschirm damit[2015/38]
English:Conductive film and touch panel including the same[2015/38]
French:Film conducteur et écran tactile le comprenant[2015/38]
Examination procedure24.07.2014Examination requested  [2015/38]
11.03.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2017Fee for grant paid
06.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)31.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
MC30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
[2019/15]
Former [2018/40]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SI30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
IT30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
SM30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
EE30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
PL30.08.2017
RO30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
SK30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT30.08.2017
CZ30.08.2017
DK30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/15]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
NL30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
LV30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT30.08.2017
ES30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
BG30.11.2017
NO30.11.2017
GR01.12.2017
IS30.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT30.08.2017
FI30.08.2017
HR30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
RS30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
SE30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI30.08.2017
LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT30.08.2017
NO30.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2009153502  (JIANG KAI-LI [CN] ET AL) [X] 1-4,9,11 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0039]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6 [I] 5,7,8,10,12-15;
 [XY]JP2012094115  (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0031]; figures 2,3 * [Y] 6;
 [X]JP2012151095  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079]; figure 7 *;
 [A]KR20130072133  (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *;
 [A]CN103080876  (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
ExaminationWO2012099394