Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2977912 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2977912



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 615
23.07.2024 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 3
04.06.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
29.05.2024 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
26.03.2024 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
22.12.2023 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
06.12.2023 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
06.12.2023 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
04.12.2023 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.2023 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.11.2023 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
14.11.2023 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
09.11.2023 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2023 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.11.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
03.11.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 11
03.11.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
03.11.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
29.09.2023 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.09.2023 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
22.09.2023 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
18.09.2023 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
18.09.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
12.09.2023 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.09.2023 F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO Appeal 5
07.09.2023 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
04.09.2023 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.10.2022 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
04.10.2022 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
09.06.2022 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
30.05.2022 Claims Appeal 9
30.05.2022 Claims Appeal 1
30.05.2022 Declaration of eligibility for a reduction of fees Appeal 1
30.05.2022 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
30.05.2022 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 2
24.05.2022 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
18.05.2022 Advice of delivery Search / examination 4
17.05.2022 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 9
17.05.2022 Claims Appeal 9
17.05.2022 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
13.05.2022 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
13.05.2022 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
13.05.2022 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
13.05.2022 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
13.05.2022 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
13.05.2022 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 10
13.05.2022 Means of redress Search / examination 2
10.05.2022 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
10.05.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.05.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.05.2022 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
10.05.2022 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.05.2022 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
29.04.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
29.04.2022 Claims Search / examination 9
29.04.2022 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.04.2022 Annex to a communication Search / examination 176
22.04.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
22.04.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex Search / examination 1
20.04.2022 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings - with annex Search / examination 1
11.04.2022 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.11.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
30.11.2021 Claims Search / examination 9
30.11.2021 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
10.11.2021 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.11.2021 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.11.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
02.11.2021 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.03.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 10
18.03.2021 Claims Search / examination 9
18.03.2021 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
12.02.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
12.02.2021 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.02.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.10.2020 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 14
05.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.09.2016 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
01.02.2016 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
07.01.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.09.2015 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.05.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Annex Search / examination 10
24.04.2015 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 10
08.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
25.02.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 (Partial) description filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 4
03.09.2014 (Partial) set of claims filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 6
03.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
03.09.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
03.09.2014 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
01.09.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.08.2014 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B Search / examination 3
01.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Claims Search / examination 9
25.07.2014 Description Search / examination 40
25.07.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8