Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811476

EP2811476 - Methods to warn proximate entities of interest and system for warning a forktruck operator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.03.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.04.2016  [2016/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rite-Hite Holding Corporation
8900 North Arbon Drive
Milwaukee, WI 53223-0043 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Beggs, Ryan P.
2260 Harold Street
Dubuque, IA 52001 / US
02 / Boerger, James C.
7007 Hoods Creek Road
Franksville, WI 53126 / US
03 / Hoffmann, David J.
15788 Chesterman Road
Peosta, IA 52068 / US
04 / Markham, Ken
1236 SW Coachlight Drive
Lee's Summit, MO 64081 / US
05 / McNeill, Matthew
5524 Santa Monica Blvd.
Whitefish Bay, WI 53217 / US
06 / Muhl, Timothy
1132 Nordic Lane
Slinger, WI 53086 / US
07 / Nelson, Kyle
W72 N444 Greystone Drive
Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US
08 / Oates, James
11550 N. Oakview Ct.
Mequon, WI 53092 / US
09 / Senfleben, Jason
3738 S. 18th Street
Milwaukee, WI 53221 / US
 [2015/15]
Former [2014/50]01 / Beggs, Ryan P.
2260 Harold Street
Dubuque, IA 52001 / US
02 / Boerger, James C.
7007 Hoods Creek Road
Franksville, WI 53126 / US
03 / Hoffmann, David J.
15788 Chesterman Road
Peosta, IA 52068 / US
04 / Markham, Ken
1236 SW Coachlight Drive
Lee's Summit, MO 64081 / US
05 / McNeill, Matthew
5524 Santa Monica Blvd.
Whitefish Bay, WI 53217 / US
06 / Muhl, Timothy
1132 Nordic Lane
Slinger, WI 53086 / US
07 / Nelson, Kyle
W72 N444 Greystone Drive
Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US
08 / Oates, James
10119 N. Concord Drive
Mequon, WI 53097 / US
09 / Senfleben, Jason
3738 S. 18th Street
Milwaukee, WI 53221 / US
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstraße 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date14002757.425.07.2011
[2014/50]
Priority number, dateUS2010084429527.07.2010         Original published format: US 844295
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2811476
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2811476
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/16, B60W30/095
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Warnen von Einheiten von Interesse in der Nähe und System zum Warnen eines Gabelstaplerfahrers[2014/50]
English:Methods to warn proximate entities of interest and system for warning a forktruck operator[2014/50]
French:Procédés pour alerter des entités d'intérêt à proximité et système pour alertir un conducteur d'un chariot élévateur[2014/50]
Examination procedure06.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
02.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/15]
17.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11754563.2  / EP2598376
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2004119818  (MUKAIYAMA YOSHIO [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0070]; figures 2-5 * [Y] 5;
 [XY]US6307484  (SASAKI KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 8 - line 65; figures 5,6 * [Y] 5;
 [Y]US2008127435  (MALY PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053]; figures 11,12 *;
 [XY]US2004193347  (HARUMOTO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 2-4 * paragraph [0205] - paragraph [0211]; figures 46,47,50A,50B,51A,52A,52B * [Y] 5;
 [XY]US2005073438  (RODGERS CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 2-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0125]; figure 16 * [Y] 5
by applicantUS2008127435