Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814097

EP2814097 - Seal structure of membrane electrode assembly for fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Obika, Motoharu
1-1 Morinosatoaoyama
Atsugi-shi Kanagawa, 243-0123 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14002874.727.02.2009
[2014/51]
Priority number, dateJP2008005051729.02.2008         Original published format: JP 2008050517
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814097
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/02, H01M8/10
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:Dichtungsstruktur einer Membranelektrodenanordnung für eine Brennstoffzelle[2014/51]
English:Seal structure of membrane electrode assembly for fuel cell[2014/51]
French:Structure d'étanchéité d'ensemble électrode à membrane pour pile à combustible[2014/51]
Examination procedure19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
13.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.04.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/21]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09714984.3  / EP2262044
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002064703  (MIZUNO SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0007] - [0012] - [0016] , [0070] - [0072] *;
 [A]US2007134538  (YUICHI AIHARA [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0039] , [0048] , [0053] , [0054] , [0083] - [0095] *;
 [A]CA2619237  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0041] - [0043] *;
 [A]US2007065705  (BOUCHER PAUL M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * figures 1a,1b * * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0024] *;
 [A]US2006159978  (SONG SEONG-MIN [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-5 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] * * example 1 *;
 [T]  - Michael Sepe, "The Effects of Temperature", (201108), Plastics technology, URL: http://www.ptonline.com/columns/the-effects-of-temperature, (20140120), XP002718971 [T] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] *
 [T]  - M. BARCLAY SATTERFIELD, PAUL W. MAJSZTRIK, HITOSHI OTA, JAY B. BENZIGER, ANDREW B. BOCARSLY, "Mechanical properties of Nafion and titania/Nafion composite membranes for polymer electrolyte membrane fuel cells", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE PART B: POLYMER PHYSICS, (20060713), vol. 44, no. 16, doi:10.1002/polb.20857, pages 2327 - 2345, XP002719022 [T] 1 * page 2333, column right - page 2335, column left *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/polb.20857
by applicantJP2006338939
 JP20080050517