Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2814097 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2814097



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 104
04.05.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.04.2016 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.04.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.04.2016 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
13.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
10.12.2014 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
18.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
05.11.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
28.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
19.08.2014 Description Search / examination 18
19.08.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
19.08.2014 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 8
19.08.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
23.09.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 20