Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2814097


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.04.2016 Withdrawal of application published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
02.12.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
02.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
22.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid