Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2853913

EP2853913 - Method and device for locating objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SmartLiberty SA
Route de Neuchâtel 46
2525 Le Landeron / CH
[2015/41]
Former [2015/14]For all designated states
(deleted)
...
Inventor(s)01 / Britz, Tobias
Ville 28
2525 Le Landeron / CH
02 / Rusca, Eric
Jolicrêt 19
2525 Le Landeron / CH
03 / Decrauzat, Vincent
Pontet 4
2013 Colombier / CH
04 / Marietta, Neil
Grand-Rue 12
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
05 / Meyrat, Loïc
Rue de Soleure 1
2525 Le Landeron / CH
06 / Gantner, Michael
Batloggstrasse 40/15
6780 Schruns / AT
07 / Beiser, Florian
Lärchenweg 8
6781 Bartholomäberg / AT
08 / Bargehr, Markus
Schöffel 380a
6780 Silbertal / AT
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/14]
Application number, filing date14003108.909.09.2014
[2015/14]
Priority number, dateDE2013101522213.09.2013         Original published format: DE102013015222
[2015/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2853913
Date:01.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2853913
Date:08.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01S1/70, G01S1/02, G06K19/07, G01S1/68, G01S13/74, G01S13/87
[2017/15]
Former International [2015/14]G01S1/70, G01S1/02, G06K19/07, G01S1/68
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2015/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lokalisierung von Objekten[2015/14]
English:Method and device for locating objects[2015/14]
French:Procédé et dispositif destinés à la localisation d'objets[2015/14]
Examination procedure27.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
28.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2017Fee for grant paid
27.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MT08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SI08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/43]CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
MT08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/40]CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RO08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CY08.11.2017
CZ08.11.2017
EE08.11.2017
ES08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
PL08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
SK08.11.2017
SM08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
LV08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
BG08.02.2018
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES08.11.2017
HR08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
RS08.11.2017
GR09.02.2018
IS08.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES08.11.2017
LT08.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2011062659  (VERSUS TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 6 * pages 7-12 * [A] 1-5,7-10;
 [A]WO2005041142  (RADIANSE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * pages 19-23 *;
 [A]WO0133748  (ELPAS ELECTRO OPTIC SYSTEMS LT [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2008061967  (CORRADO ANTHONY P [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0059] - [0091] *;
 [A]US2008218351  (CORRADO ANTHONY P [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0046] - [0056] *;
 [A]US2008061962  (CAMPMAN ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0053] - [0055] *;
 [A]WO2004104619  (HILL ROM SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1657562  (SAAB AB [SE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0030] - [0036] *;
 [A]US5917425  (CRIMMINS JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MARTIN B W ED - SANSON L D, "WatchIt. A fully supervised identification, location and tracking system", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, 1995. PROCEEDINGS. INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND EL ECTRONICS ENGINEERS 29TH ANNUAL 1995 INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON SANDERSTEAD, UK 18-20 OCT. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19951018), doi:10.1109/CCST.1995.524928, ISBN 978-0-7803-2627-9, pages 306 - 310, XP010196430 [A] 1-10 * pages 308,309 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1995.524928