Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821842

EP2821842 - Backlight unit and liquid crystal display including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Go, Wangseop
c/o LG Electronics Inc., IP Center LG Institute
16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu
137-724 Seoul / KR
02 / Seo, Sangho
c/o LG Electronics Inc., IP Center LG Institute
16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu
137-724 Seoul / KR
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/02]
Former [2015/02]Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date14003271.512.10.2010
[2015/02]
Priority number, dateUS20090260540P12.11.2009         Original published format: US 260540 P
KR2009010895312.11.2009         Original published format: KR 20090108953
US20100301358P04.02.2010         Original published format: US 301358 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821842
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2821842
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1333, G02F1/13357, G02B6/00, F21V8/00
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:Rückbeleuchtungseinheit und Flüssigkristallanzeige damit[2015/02]
English:Backlight unit and liquid crystal display including the same[2015/02]
French:Unité de rétroéclairage et affichage à cristaux liquides doté de celle-ci[2015/02]
Examination procedure22.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
02.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.11.2016Fee for grant paid
30.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10830111.0  / EP2499537
Divisional application(s)EP16170013.3  / EP3101467
EP18156894.0  / EP3339947
Opposition(s)12.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
22.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2010
AT11.01.2017
CY11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
MK11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
[2019/52]
Former [2019/47]HU12.10.2010
AT11.01.2017
CY11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2019/31]HU12.10.2010
AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2018/29]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
MC11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2018/14]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SI11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/51]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
SM11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/50]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
DK11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/49]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
EE11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RO11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
SK11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/48]AT11.01.2017
CZ11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Former [2017/41]AT11.01.2017
ES11.01.2017
FI11.01.2017
HR11.01.2017
LT11.01.2017
LV11.01.2017
PL11.01.2017
RS11.01.2017
SE11.01.2017
BG11.04.2017
NO11.04.2017
GR12.04.2017
IS11.05.2017
PT11.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009256987  (JEON WOOK [KR] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 6-9 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] *;
 [A]US2008088763  (TORIYAMA YOSHIO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041] *;
 [E]EP2251721  (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1,4,5,8,12-15 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0046] *