blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2873329 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2873329



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 253
23.03.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
18.05.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.04.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
04.04.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.03.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.03.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
22.03.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
14.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
14.12.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
14.12.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
14.12.2016 Description Search / examination 14
14.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.12.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.02.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Priority search results Search / examination 1
29.01.2016 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
21.01.2016 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
30.11.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.11.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
20.11.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
18.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.11.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
18.11.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.11.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 2
09.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
06.10.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
22.04.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
01.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 7
01.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 4
04.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
10.12.2014 Communication confirming the (new) filing date accorded Search / examination 2
06.12.2014 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 3
06.12.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 (Partial) set of drawings filed in response to formal objections Search / examination 3
03.12.2014 Annex Search / examination 2
03.12.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.12.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
28.11.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Invitation to file missing parts of the description/drawings Search / examination 2
15.11.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
12.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.11.2014 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
07.11.2014 Declaration for SMEs Search / examination 1
06.11.2014 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
06.11.2014 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.11.2014 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
06.11.2014 Priority document Search / examination 31
27.10.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
27.10.2014 Description Search / examination 19
27.10.2014 Drawings Search / examination 2
27.10.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.10.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 3
27.10.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8