blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2873329
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2873329T 31.08.2017T1
Priority number Date
EP14003635 27.10.2014
CZ2013885 15.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2873329Global Dossier 17.05.2017B1
EP2873329 20.05.2015A1
Priority number Date
CZ2013885 15.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ2013885 19.08.2015A3
CZ305371 19.08.2015B6
Priority number Date
CZ2013885 15.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK2873329T 04.09.2017T3
Priority number Date
CZ2013885 15.11.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
LT2873329T 25.08.2017T
Priority number Date
CZ2013885 15.11.2013